Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Platas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1668BornChinchón
1 Oct 173264.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
1 Oct 173264.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
7 Dec 173264.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
2 Nov 174577.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Platas:
Bishop José Platas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014