Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González García

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1683Born
26 Oct 173854.9SelectedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
26 Jan 173955.1ConfirmedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
17 May 173955.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
20 May 174359.4AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
7 Apr 175874.3DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González García
Bishop Pedro González García (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrelaguna
Ordained BishopSt. Genes, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 409
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 58, Number 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,974

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast