Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián José Victoria Emparán y Loyola, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1683BornAzpeitia
15 May 174764.3AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
25 Jun 174764.4Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
2 Oct 175673.7DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián José Victoria Emparán y Loyola:
Bishop Sebastián José Victoria Emparán y Loyola O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013