Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Marín, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1699BornCalahorra
29 Jan 174849.0AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
24 Mar 174849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
27 Apr 175051.2AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
10 Aug 176970.5DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito Marín:
Bishop Benito Marín O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115, and Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015