Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Eulate y Santa Cruz

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1684³Born
25 Jan 174560.4AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
27 May 174560.7Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
16 Sep 175571.0DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Eulate y Santa Cruz
Bishop Juan de Eulate y Santa Cruz (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalvatierra
Ordained BishopS. Philippe Neri, Oratory, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 63, Number 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,502
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast