Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mezquía Díaz de Arrízola, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1688BornSalvatierra
1710²21.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
16 Sep 174658.5AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
30 Nov 174658.7Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
9 Sep 177284.5DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Mezquía Díaz de Arrízola:
Bishop José Mezquía Díaz de Arrízola O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013