Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Froilán Saavedra Sanjurjo

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1686¹Born
27 Feb 173650.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Feb 173650.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
13 May 173650.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
31 May 174256.4DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Froilán Saavedra Sanjurjo
Archbishop Bernardo Froilán Saavedra Sanjurjo (born 1686, died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuy

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 54, Number 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,736, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast