Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matías Escalzo Acedo

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1690BornSesma
4 Mar 174857.7AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
19 May 174857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
11 Nov 174959.4DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Matías Escalzo Acedo:
Bishop Matías Escalzo Acedo (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013