Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cepeda

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca

Note/Previous Titular See: (appointment to Coria occurred after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1687BornLa Puebla de Montalbán
13 Jul 174457.0AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
11 Oct 174457.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Jan 175062.5DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
19 Jan 175062.5AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Cepeda:
Bishop José Cepeda (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157, and Page 273
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 62, Number 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015