Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Morales Blanco

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹BornFuente la Encina
3 Jul 174143.5AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
5 Nov 174143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
29 May 174547.4DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Morales Blanco:
Bishop José Morales Blanco (born 1698, died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015