Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Martínez Garrido, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena

Titular Bishop of Tricale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1690BornSaceda del Río, Spain
6 Mar 174150.9AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
5 Nov 174151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 Aug 174656.3ResignedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 Aug 174656.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
5 Feb 175766.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Diego Martínez Garrido:
Bishop Diego Martínez Garrido O.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013