Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Broderick, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Petnelissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1882BornKilflynn, Ireland
15 Jul 190623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
24 Aug 191835.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}
24 Aug 191835.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
8 Dec 191836.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
13 Oct 193350.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}

MicroData Summary for Thomas Broderick:
Bishop Thomas Broderick S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013