Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-François Philippe, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Vizagapatam, India

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1835Born
14 Jul 186227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
24 Aug 188651.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vizagapatam, India
24 Aug 188651.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
30 Nov 188651.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
27 Sep 189055.2ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Vizagapatam, India
16 Apr 190468.7DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Vizagapatam, India

MicroData Summary for Jules-François Philippe
Bishop Jules-François Philippe M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Vizagapatam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnnecy, Diocese of Annecy, France
Ordained BishopVisitation, Annecy, Diocese of Annecy, France

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017