Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Terrien, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

Titular Bishop of Gordus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1877BornSaint-André-des-Eaux, France
15 Jul 190022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
1 Mar 191234.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
1 Mar 191234.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gordus
1 Jul 191234.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gordus
3 Aug 192951.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Terrien:
Bishop Ferdinand Terrien S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015