Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo León Alvarado, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huacho, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1928Born
2 Sep 194012.2EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
6 Jun 194416.0Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
10 Aug 194921.1Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
27 Jan 195223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Aug 196739.1AppointedBishop of Huacho, Peru
17 Sep 196739.2Ordained BishopBishop of Huacho, Peru
22 Sep 196739.3InstalledBishop of Huacho, Peru
22 Apr 200374.8RetiredBishop of Huacho, Peru
17 Feb 202091.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Huacho, Peru

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo León Alvarado
Bishop Lorenzo León Alvarado O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huacho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCallao
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Buried Place (Original)La Merced mausoleum, El Ángel, Cemetery, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/qodm: CB, 19 Dec 2019
  • i/d: CB, 17 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast