Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Óscar Hernán Blanco Martínez, O.M.D.

Bishop of San Juan Bautista de Calama, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1964 Born
1 Mar 199328.4ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of the Mother of God
17 Mar 199631.4Solemn VowsMember of Clerics Regular of the Mother of God
5 May 199631.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of the Mother of God
13 Apr 199732.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of the Mother of God
19 Mar 201651.4AppointedBishop of San Juan Bautista de Calama, Chile
19 May 201651.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan Bautista de Calama, Chile

MicroData Summary for Óscar Hernán Blanco Martínez
Bishop Óscar Hernán Blanco Martínez O.M.D. (born ) Bishop of San Juan Bautista de Calama

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Domínguez

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Juan Bautista de Calama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 23 Mar 2016
  • c2: CB, 20 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,914

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018