Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ettore Felici

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1881Born
20 Sep 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Segni, Italy
6 Nov 192746.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
9 Nov 192746.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
30 Dec 192746.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
20 Apr 193857.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
15 Jan 194664.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
2 Sep 194968.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
9 May 195170.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland

MicroData Summary for Ettore Felici
Archbishop Ettore Felici (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ireland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegni
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 77
  • opd: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 90, and Page 155, and Page 156
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast