Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Juan Bautista de Calama

Dioecesis Sancti Ioannis Baptistae de Calama



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 20 February 2010
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antofagasta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 43,000 (16,608 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiadecalama.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Pasaje Mons. Juan Bautista Herrera 1664, Calama, Chile
  • Telephone: (055)650.411; 650.400
  • Fax: 650.410; 650.406

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Calama
21 July 1965ErectedDiocese of Antofagasta
Diocese of Iquique
Territorial Prelature of Calama (erected)
28 June 1967Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Calama (from La Serena to Antofagasta)
Diocese of San Juan Bautista de Calama
20 February 2010ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Calama Diocese of San Juan Bautista de Calama

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Calama
196575,000.0%741104ap1967
196891,00095,00095.8%74118,2726103ap1971
1976100,000115,00087.0%44812,50010104ap1977
1980100,000119,00084.0%78156,66611124ap1981
1990115,000130,00088.5%641011,50014178ap1991
1999132,411159,53283.0%831112,0373389ap2000
2000132,411159,53283.0%831112,0373389ap2001
2001132,411159,53283.0%831112,03733810ap2002
2002132,411159,53283.0%1021211,03432710ap2003
2003125,702152,64982.3%103139,66923410ap2004
2004127,331154,27882.5%921111,57522410ap2005
Diocese of San Juan Bautista de Calama
2010132,000161,00082.0%144187,3331044011ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 25 Feb 2014