Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Leni

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573BornRome
4 Jul 160835.5AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
20 Jul 160835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
24 Nov 160835.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 160835.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
3 Aug 161138.6AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
5 Mar 161845.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
162047.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
3 Nov 162754.8DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Leni:
Giambattista Cardinal Leni (died ) Bishop of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Nov 1608
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Mar 2014