Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maffeo Vitale, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Feb 1646AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
11 Feb 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
23 Jun 1669DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Vitale:
Bishop Maffeo Vitale O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 673
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013