Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Arrigua, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornMonforte
6 Oct 167055.7AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
19 Oct 167055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
12 Nov 169075.8DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Arrigua:
Bishop Francesco Arrigua O.M. (died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015