Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Archinto

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1500Born
19 Mar 153938.7AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
19 Oct 154646.2AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
1554²53.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1556²55.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
16 Dec 155656.4AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Jun 155857.9DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Archinto (VIAF: 67568199)
Archbishop Filippo Archinto (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 240, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: AT, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 7 Oct 2017