Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Rocci, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1615ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
6 May 1658AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
26 May 1658Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
Oct 1661³DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Rocci:
Bishop Benedetto Rocci O. Carm. (died Oct 1661) Bishop of Nusco

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 263
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015