Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano d’Alessandro, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1603Born
15 Jan 167268.2AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
25 Feb 167268.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
29 Dec 167269.1DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano d’Alessandro
Bishop Sebastiano d’Alessandro O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotta San Giovanni

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast