Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maraviglia, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
12 Dec 166750.9AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
18 Dec 166750.9Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Sep 168467.7DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Maraviglia
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maraviglia C.R. (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast