Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Visconti

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
3 Oct 166750.7AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
9 Oct 166750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
26 Oct 167053.8DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Visconti
Bishop Gerolamo Visconti (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,667, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast