Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Vaccina

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1620Born
1 Apr 164524.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 166444.3AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
28 Sep 166444.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
26 Aug 167151.3DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Vaccina
Bishop Marco Vaccina (born , died ) Bishop of Trevico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAfragola

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346
  • b/c2: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast