Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Isola


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Sep 1659AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
5 Oct 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
9 Sep 1679DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rossi:
Bishop Carlo Rossi (died ) Bishop of Isola

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013