Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gheri

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
31 May 165551.4AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
27 Jun 1655³51.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
1662¹58.0DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gheri (VIAF: 44644678)
Bishop Francesco Gheri (born 1604, died 1662) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 41
  • ob/c2: AT, 10 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast