Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gavino Cattayna, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1608³Born
26 Nov 166355.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
30 Nov 166355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
26 Apr 167162.4SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
16 Nov 167163.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
Dec 1678²70.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gavino Cattayna
Archbishop Gavino Cattayna O. Carm. (born Nov 1608, died Dec 1678) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast