Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Isimbardi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1630Born
6 Oct 167040.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
19 Oct 167040.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
27 Sep 167545.0DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Isimbardi
Bishop Pietro Isimbardi O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavie

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast