Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Stefano Anastasio Cardinal Ciceri

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1616Born
22 Sep 165942.7AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
5 Oct 165942.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
13 May 168063.3AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
2 Sep 168669.6Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jul 168770.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
24 Jun 169477.4DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Stefano Anastasio Ciceri
Carlo Stefano Anastasio Cardinal Ciceri (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 77
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Nov 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,659, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast