Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Macchiavelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
11 Oct 163830.7AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
2 Feb 163931.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
26 Mar 164032.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
16 Dec 164133.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 May 164234.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
22 Nov 165345.8DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Macchiavelli (VIAF: 218624734)
Francesco Maria Cardinal Macchiavelli (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSt. Mariä Himmelfahrt, Church, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Death PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
  • a cardinal for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 162, and Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 35
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 3 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Mar 2019

Quantcast