Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Aloysius O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1903BornChicago
24 Sep 192723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
17 Dec 194845.0AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
7 Mar 194945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
22 Jul 197571.6ResignedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
14 Nov 198379.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Springfield in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for William Aloysius O’Connor:
Bishop William Aloysius O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Illinois

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013