Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Franz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1896BornSpringfield, IL
13 Jun 192023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Alton, Illinois, USA
27 May 195154.5AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
29 Aug 195154.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
8 Aug 195962.7AppointedBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
24 May 197174.5RetiredBishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 199295.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Franz:
Bishop John Baptist Franz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Peoria

  • a priest for 72.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015