Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cletus Francis O’Donnell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1917BornWaukon, IA
3 May 194123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
26 Oct 196043.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
26 Oct 196043.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abrittum
21 Dec 196043.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abrittum
18 Feb 196749.4AppointedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
28 Apr 199274.6RetiredBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
31 Aug 199275.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Cletus Francis O’Donnell:
Bishop Cletus Francis O’Donnell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Madison

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015