Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luy Gonzaga Nguyn Hng Vi

Bishop of Kontum, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1952 Born
7 Apr 199037.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kontum, Viet Nam
7 Oct 201563.1AppointedBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
3 Dec 201563.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Luy Gonzaga Nguyn Hng Vi
Bishop Luy Gonzaga Nguyn Hng Vi (born ) Bishop of Kontum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceH Ni

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kontum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 23 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 3 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,678

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast