Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Phụng Hiểu

Deceased

Bishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1921Born
26 May 195130.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199069.7AppointedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
11 Apr 199170.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
9 May 199271.1DiedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyễn Phụng Hiểu
Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Phụng Hiểu (born , died ) Bishop of Hưng Ha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNinh Binh

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,396
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast