Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernst Franz Gerd Werner Dicke

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

Titular Bishop of Iria Flavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1928 BornErfurt
25 Jul 195224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
16 Feb 197041.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
16 Feb 197041.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Iria Flavia
11 Apr 197042.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iria Flavia
21 Nov 200375.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ernst Franz Gerd Werner Dicke:
Bishop Ernst Franz Gerd Werner Dicke (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aachen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013