Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Borsch

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Crepedula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1959 Born
26 Sep 199233.1Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
21 Nov 200344.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
21 Nov 200344.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
17 Jan 200444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Crepedula

MicroData Summary for Karl Borsch
Bishop Karl Borsch (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrefeld-Hüls

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aachen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast