Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nei Paulo Moretto

Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1936 BornCaxias do Sul
2 Jul 196125.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 197236.5AppointedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
28 Jan 197336.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
21 Jan 197639.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
21 Jan 197639.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
26 May 198347.0SucceededBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Jul 201175.1RetiredBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Nei Paulo Moretto:
Bishop Nei Paulo Moretto (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caxias do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014