Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Sarto, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1926Born
1 Jun 195125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 May 197145.2AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
18 May 197145.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
15 Aug 197145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
26 May 197852.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
16 Oct 197953.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
25 Mar 198256.0AppointedBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
23 May 200175.2ResignedBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
29 Sep 200882.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Sarto
Bishop Antônio Sarto S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barra do Garças

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLins

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018