Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diógenes da Silva Matthes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1931Born
29 Jun 195725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
11 Mar 197139.4AppointedBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jun 197139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Nov 200675.1RetiredBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Nov 201685.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Diógenes da Silva Matthes
Bishop Diógenes da Silva Matthes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Franca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaconde
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ribeirão Preto, Archdiocese of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2006
  • d: CB, 20 Nov 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 781
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,207
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast