Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Pedro Torres Farías, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catamarca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1917Born
29 Dec 194023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Sep 196245.3AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
23 Dec 196245.5Ordained BishopBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
3 Mar 196345.7InstalledBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
5 Nov 198871.4DiedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Pedro Torres Farías
Bishop Alfonso Pedro Torres Farías O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Catamarca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Agustín

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast