Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estêvão Cardoso de Avellar, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1917Born
6 Oct 194628.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Aug 197153.7AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Marabá, Para, Brazil
6 Aug 197153.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
26 Sep 197153.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
27 Mar 197658.3AppointedPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Para, Brazil
20 Mar 197860.3AppointedBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Dec 199275.1RetiredBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Dec 200992.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Estêvão Cardoso de Avellar
Bishop Estêvão Cardoso de Avellar O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Uberlândia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrês Corações

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast