Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Orberá y Carrión

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1827Born
1 Dec 185023.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 187547.6SelectedBishop of Almería, Spain
23 Sep 187547.8ConfirmedBishop of Almería, Spain
12 Mar 187648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
23 Nov 188659.0DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Orberá y Carrión (VIAF: 88664481)
Bishop José María Orberá y Carrión (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 45, Number 30
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017