Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ponciano Arciniega

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1805BornHerrán
Jun 1830³24.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 185751.7SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
25 Sep 185751.8ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
3 Jan 185852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
3 Sep 186862.8DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ponciano Arciniega:
Bishop Ponciano Arciniega (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013