Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Saturnino Fernandez de Castro y de la Cotera

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1827Born
18 Jun 187548.3SelectedBishop of León, Spain
5 Jul 187548.4ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
3 Oct 187548.6Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
15 Mar 188356.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
26 Apr 188659.2DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Saturnino Fernandez de Castro y de la Cotera
Archbishop Saturnino Fernandez de Castro y de la Cotera (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComillas
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 41, Number 12
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017