Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anastasio Rodrigo Yusto

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1814BornBurgo de Osma
1838¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 185743.4SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
25 Sep 185743.4ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
27 Dec 185743.7Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
19 Sep 186753.4SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Sep 186753.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
30 Apr 188268.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Rodrigo Yusto:
Archbishop Anastasio Rodrigo Yusto (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 163, and Page 491
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013