Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Soldevilla y Romero

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1843Born
28 Dec 1867³24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
14 Feb 188945.3AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
28 Apr 188945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
16 Dec 190158.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
15 Dec 191976.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Apr 192076.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
2 May 192076.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
4 Jun 192379.6DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Soldevilla y Romero
Juan Cardinal Soldevilla y Romero (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuentelapeña, Diocese of Zamora
Ordained PriestValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Buried Place (Original)Blessed Virgin Mary of El Pilar, Basilica, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
  • a cardinal for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 555
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 22
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017